Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 976 Today
» 1042 Yesterday
» 7493 Week
» 7493 Month
» 74355 Year
» 1739731 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 52 m/e 10/1920
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6852 m/e 06/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2279 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 62279 w/e 11/12/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/1920 GLEN GRANT

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Pickersgill / T. Heywood
Class D40
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L730
Works Number 22565
To Service During 10/1920
Withdrawal Thu 19/05/1955
Service Life 34 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1955

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1920
KIT   Kittybrewster on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 19/05/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 19/05/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
22/03/1952 Easter Workings on the Buchan line With the arrival of the new Class 4MT 2-6-4 tanks at Kittybrewster, some of the turns on the Buchan section have been taken over by the new locomotives. 80020 works the 11.22 No. 1 Express-the 'Fisher' -from Fraserburgh to Kittybrewster while 80029 handles the 16.02 passenger Aberdeen-Fraserburgh. However, many of the Aberdeen-Fraserburgh trains are still worked by locomotives of the old D40, D41, B1 or B12 classes. A B1 is in charge of the 12.25 passenger from Fraserburgh and 62260, 62276 'Andrew Bain' or 62279 'Glen Grant' deals with the 12.50 goods to Kittybrewster. But the most startling change has taken place on the St. Combs Light Railway. Here Class 2MT 2-6-0, No. 46460, shedded at 64A, has been fitted with cowcatchers 'fore and aft' (to use a nautical phrase) and has taken over the duties previously performed by ex-G.E.R. 2-4-2 tanks 67151 an 67164, both of which have been scrapped. But 67157, of the same class, still lingers on and shares duties with the new engine. The crews consider that 46460 is an excellent machine, but I was informed that, some time after its arrival, it was reported for working 10lb. over pressure! SLS/195206

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1920 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 52, name: GLEN GRANT
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22565
   
06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6852    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2279    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT)    
11/12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62279    
19/05/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 62279    
07/1955 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev