Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 934 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 3099 Week
» 3099 Month
» 69961 Year
» 1735337 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 45 m/e 06/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6845 m/e 05/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2273 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 62273 w/e 24/07/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
06/1921 GEORGE DAVIDSON

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Pickersgill / T. Heywood
Class D40
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Inverurie Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 06/1921
Withdrawal Fri 14/01/1955
Service Life 33 yrs, 7 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1955

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1921
61C   Keith 4w/e 23/02/1952
     Withdrawn on 14/01/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 23/02/1952
WDN   on 14/01/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1950 Inverurie Works Locomotives entering Works during January: These included Nos. 61508/21, 62273, 4483, 64490, ex-L.M.S. 15144, 15222/66, 56326, 17235/55, 57289. SLS/195003

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1921 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 45, name: GEORGE DAVIDSON
Built at Inverurie Works
   
05/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6845    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2273    
24/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62273    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
14/01/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 62273    
02/1955 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev