Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 751 Today
» 1083 Yesterday
» 5223 Week
» 24124 Month
» 24124 Year
» 1689500 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 46 m/e 09/1921
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6846 m/e 07/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2274 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 62274 w/e 07/05/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
09/1921 BENACHIE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Pickersgill / T. Heywood
Class D40
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Inverurie Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
To Service During 09/1921
Withdrawal Tue 20/09/1955
Service Life 34 yrs , 20 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 09/1921
KIT Kittybrewster on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61C Keith 4w/e 26/01/1952
61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 07/08/1954
   Withdrawn on 20/09/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 61A Kittybrewster 4w/e 10/07/1954
WDN   on 20/09/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1921 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 46, name: BENACHIE
Built at Inverurie Works
   
07/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6846    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2274    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT)    
07/05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62274    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
07/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A)    
20/09/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 62274    

prev