Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 899 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 3064 Week
» 3064 Month
» 69926 Year
» 1735302 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 78 m/e 12/1893
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6878 m/e 06/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2225 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 62225 w/e 04/12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Johnson / W. Pickersgill
Class D41
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number E711
Works Number 4640
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram 88
Train Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 12/1893
Withdrawal Fri 20/02/1953
Service Life 59 yrs, 2 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1953

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1893
KIT   Kittybrewster on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61C   Keith 4w/e 23/12/1950
61C   Keith m/e 31/12/1950
     Withdrawn on 20/02/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61C Keith m/e 31/12/1950
WDN   on 20/02/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1913 Steam heating apparatus
03/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/02/1947 Cowlairs Works A very unusual visitor to Cowlairs was 'D.41' No. 2225, being ex. works and returned to Kittybrewster. SLS/194704
31/07/1951 G.N.O.S. Section - Boat of Garten The Craigellachie-Boat of Garten train is now worked completely by 62277 (61B) Gordon Highlander. This train in the last two weeks has become very interesting in that it has been composed of a G.N.S. 1st/3rd corridor of 1898 and a N.E.R. 3rd brake clerestory. The S.O. 9.18 p.m. (picture house train) has also contained unusual coaches. A G.N.R. 3rd corridor and a G.C. 1st/3rd brake, the compartments of which contain original G.C. pictures, below which are details of the G.C. routes. The afternoon freight from Craigellachie now works right through to Aviemore and back the same day. D40's and 41's seen at 'The Boat' lately include 62225/30/41/2/8/62/9/71/7. SLS/195109
31/07/1952 Keith MPD Engines at Keith shed were 62231, 62225/42/56/65/8/9/72/5, 61502/7/8, 67292, 54473 an 57597. SLS/195208

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1893 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 78
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4640
   
07/1913 Modification Modification: Steam heating apparatus    
06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6878    
03/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2225    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT)    
04/12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62225    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
20/02/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 62225    
06/1953 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev