Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1033 Today
» 1042 Yesterday
» 7550 Week
» 7550 Month
» 74412 Year
» 1739788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 80 m/e 12/1893
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6880 m/e 11/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2227 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 62227 w/e 06/11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Johnson / W. Pickersgill
Class D41
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number E711
Works Number 4642
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram 88
Train Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 12/1893
Withdrawal Mon 19/03/1951
Service Life 57 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1893
KIT   Kittybrewster on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
KEI   Keith w/e 12/03/1949
     Withdrawn on 19/03/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KEI Keith w/e 12/03/1949
WDN   on 19/03/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1915 Steam heating apparatus
1923 Vacuum Ejector fitted
08/1946 LNER Diagram 88B boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1893 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 80
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4642
   
03/1915 Modification Modification: Steam heating apparatus    
1923 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
11/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6880    
08/1946 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 88B boiler fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2227    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT)    
06/11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62227    
12/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (KEI)    
19/03/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 62227    

prev prev