Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 829 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2994 Week
» 2994 Month
» 69856 Year
» 1735232 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 81 m/e 12/1893
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6881 m/e 12/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2228 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 62228 w/e 18/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Johnson / W. Pickersgill
Class D41
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number E711
Works Number 4643
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram 88
Train Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 12/1893
Withdrawal Tue 05/02/1952
Service Life 58 yrs, 2 mths , 6 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1893
KIT   Kittybrewster on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61C   Keith 4w/e 08/09/1951
61C   Keith 8w/e 09/09/1951
     Withdrawn on 05/02/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61C Keith 4w/e 08/09/1951
WDN   on 05/02/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
1910 Vacuum Ejector fitted
09/1913 Steam heating apparatus


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1893 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 81
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4643
   
1910 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
09/1913 Modification Modification: Steam heating apparatus    
12/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6881    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2228    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT)    
18/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62228    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
09/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
05/02/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 62228    

prev prev