Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 35 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 35 Week
» 7647 Month
» 74509 Year
» 1739885 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 82 m/e 12/1893
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6882 m/e 07/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2229 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 62229 w/e 01/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Johnson / W. Pickersgill
Class D41
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number E711
Works Number 4644
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram 88
Train Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 12/1893
Withdrawal Mon 17/12/1951
Service Life 58 yrs , 17 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1893
KIT   Kittybrewster on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61C   Keith m/e 31/01/1951
61C   Keith 4w/e 17/02/1951
     Withdrawn on 17/12/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KIT Kittybrewster 9w/e 31/03/1946
ALLOC 61C Keith m/e 31/01/1951
WDN   on 17/12/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1916 Steam heating apparatus
07/1926 Vacuum Ejector fitted
03/1947 LNER Diagram 88B boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1893 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 82
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4644
   
01/1916 Modification Modification: Steam heating apparatus    
07/1926 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
07/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 6882    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2229    
03/1947 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 88B boiler fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT)    
01/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62229    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
17/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
17/12/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 62229    

prev prev