Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 93 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5568 Week
» 5568 Month
» 72430 Year
» 1737806 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 83 m/e 12/1893
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6883 m/e 03/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2230 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 62230 w/e 30/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Johnson / W. Pickersgill
Class D41
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number E711
Works Number 4645
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram 88
Train Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 12/1893
Withdrawal Tue 18/03/1952
Service Life 58 yrs, 3 mths , 17 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1893
KIT   Kittybrewster on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61C   Keith 4w/e 23/12/1950
61C   Keith m/e 31/12/1950
     Withdrawn on 18/03/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61C Keith m/e 31/12/1950
WDN   on 18/03/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1914 Steam heating apparatus
07/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1951 G.N.O.S. Section - Boat of Garten The Craigellachie-Boat of Garten train is now worked completely by 62277 (61B) Gordon Highlander. This train in the last two weeks has become very interesting in that it has been composed of a G.N.S. 1st/3rd corridor of 1898 and a N.E.R. 3rd brake clerestory. The S.O. 9.18 p.m. (picture house train) has also contained unusual coaches. A G.N.R. 3rd corridor and a G.C. 1st/3rd brake, the compartments of which contain original G.C. pictures, below which are details of the G.C. routes. The afternoon freight from Craigellachie now works right through to Aviemore and back the same day. D40's and 41's seen at 'The Boat' lately include 62225/30/41/2/8/62/9/71/7. SLS/195109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1893 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 83
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4645
   
10/1914 Modification Modification: Steam heating apparatus    
03/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6883    
07/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2230    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT)    
30/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62230    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
18/03/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 62230    

prev prev