Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 654 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 654 Week
» 8266 Month
» 75128 Year
» 1740504 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 96 m/e 12/1895
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6896 m/e 06/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2240 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 62240 w/e 17/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Johnson / W. Pickersgill
Class D41
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number E747
Works Number 4880
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram 88
Train Brakes Westinghouse
Safety Valves Ramsbottom
To Service During 12/1895
Withdrawal Sat 29/10/1949
Service Life 53 yrs, 10 mths , 29 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1895
KEI   Keith on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 29/10/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN KEI Keith on 29/10/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1915 Steam heating apparatus
11/1926 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1949 Inverurie Works Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61508/24, 62240/60/65, 64466/71, 64500, 4531, 5229, 65279, 68192, ex-L.M.S. 44254, 4324, 15136, 17251, 17359, 17450/51. SLS/194912

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1895 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 96
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4880
   
10/1915 Modification Modification: Steam heating apparatus    
06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6896    
11/1926 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2240    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Keith (KEI)    
17/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62240    
29/10/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 62240    

prev prev