Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 1090 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 2159 Week
» 2159 Month
» 69021 Year
» 1734397 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 97 m/e 12/1895
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6897 m/e 10/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2241 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 62241 w/e 23/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Johnson / W. Pickersgill
Class D41
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number E747
Works Number 4881
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram 88
Train Brakes Westinghouse
Safety Valves Ramsbottom
To Service During 12/1895
Withdrawal Mon 23/02/1953
Service Life 57 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1953

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1895
KIT   Kittybrewster on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 23/02/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KEI Keith 4w/e 23/03/1946
WDN   on 23/02/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1912 Steam heating apparatus
1936 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1950 Inverurie Works Engines into shops: 5282, 5323, 61543, 61560, 62241, 62255, 64466, 64477, 64487, 65236, 65306, 65340, and (L.M.S) 14447, 17326, 44312, 57337. SLS/195008
31/07/1951 G.N.O.S. Section - Boat of Garten The Craigellachie-Boat of Garten train is now worked completely by 62277 (61B) Gordon Highlander. This train in the last two weeks has become very interesting in that it has been composed of a G.N.S. 1st/3rd corridor of 1898 and a N.E.R. 3rd brake clerestory. The S.O. 9.18 p.m. (picture house train) has also contained unusual coaches. A G.N.R. 3rd corridor and a G.C. 1st/3rd brake, the compartments of which contain original G.C. pictures, below which are details of the G.C. routes. The afternoon freight from Craigellachie now works right through to Aviemore and back the same day. D40's and 41's seen at 'The Boat' lately include 62225/30/41/2/8/62/9/71/7. SLS/195109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1895 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 97
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4881
   
06/1912 Modification Modification: Steam heating apparatus    
10/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6897    
1936 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2241    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT)    
23/04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62241    
23/02/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 62241    
04/1953 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev