Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 113 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4459 Week
» 4459 Month
» 71321 Year
» 1736697 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 98 m/e 12/1895
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6898 m/e 04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2242 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 62242 w/e 09/10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Johnson / W. Pickersgill
Class D41
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number E747
Works Number 4882
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram 88
Train Brakes Westinghouse
Safety Valves Ramsbottom
To Service During 12/1895
Withdrawal Mon 23/02/1953
Service Life 57 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1895
KIT   Kittybrewster on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
KEI   Keith w/e 10/12/1949
     Withdrawn on 23/02/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KEI Keith w/e 10/12/1949
WDN   on 23/02/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1915 Steam heating apparatus
07/1933 LNER Diagram 88B boiler fitted
1936 Vacuum Ejector fitted
05/1942 LNER Diagram 88 boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/08/1947 Inverurie Works On 20/8 the following locos. were in the Works yard: 'D31' 2071, 'J36' (Number painted out but carrying plate 9653 - identified as 5229), old No. 'D41' 6879 (old No.), 'J36' 5251/72/87/91, 5302/32/36 (the latter marked 'scrap') 'G10' 7505, all complete; whilst those stripped were: 'D40' 2266/80, 'D31' (bearing plate 9765, old No.), 2067, 'J36' 5212/19. Locos. in the Works were 'D40' 2262/75, 'D41' 2234/42/44, 'J35' 4463/82/84, 'J36' 5257/69/84, 5325, while 'D41' 2256 and 'G5' 7287 were ex Works freshly painted. SLS/194710
31/07/1951 G.N.O.S. Section - Boat of Garten The Craigellachie-Boat of Garten train is now worked completely by 62277 (61B) Gordon Highlander. This train in the last two weeks has become very interesting in that it has been composed of a G.N.S. 1st/3rd corridor of 1898 and a N.E.R. 3rd brake clerestory. The S.O. 9.18 p.m. (picture house train) has also contained unusual coaches. A G.N.R. 3rd corridor and a G.C. 1st/3rd brake, the compartments of which contain original G.C. pictures, below which are details of the G.C. routes. The afternoon freight from Craigellachie now works right through to Aviemore and back the same day. D40's and 41's seen at 'The Boat' lately include 62225/30/41/2/8/62/9/71/7. SLS/195109
31/07/1952 Keith MPD Engines at Keith shed were 62231, 62225/42/56/65/8/9/72/5, 61502/7/8, 67292, 54473 an 57597. SLS/195208

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1895 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 98
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4882
   
07/1915 Modification Modification: Steam heating apparatus    
04/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6898    
07/1933 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 88B boiler fitted    
1936 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
05/1942 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 88 boiler fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2242    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT)    
09/10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62242    
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (KEI)    
23/02/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 62242    

prev prev