Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great North of Scotland Railway |
19 |
m/e |
02/1896 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
6819 |
m/e |
04/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2231 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
62231 |
w/e |
03/04/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Johnson / W. Pickersgill |
Class |
D41 |
Company History |
GNSR/LNER |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Neilson, Reid & Co. |
Order Number |
E747 |
Works Number |
4885 |
Fittings (as built) |
Boiler | Diagram 88 | Train Brakes | Westinghouse | Safety Valves | Ramsbottom |
|
To Service |
During 02/1896 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 21/11/1952 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1896 |
KIT |
|
Kittybrewster |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
KEI |
|
Keith |
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
21/11/1952 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
KEI |
Keith |
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
21/11/1952 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
10/1913 |
Steam heating apparatus |
1937 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1950 |
Inverurie Works |
Engines due into Works, July 1950: 40613/65, 55136, 57299, 57338, 61505, 62231, 4482, 64534, 65228/36/73, 65309, 8749. |
SLS/195010 |
31/07/1951 |
G.N.O.S. Section - Keith |
In an afternoon's observation at the Junction B1's 61343/8/52, D41's 62231/56, D40's 62262, 62264/9, and B12/1 61508 were seen. The B1's were in excellent condition. The others were just clean. 62269 has a crest and also a tender cab. 62231 in plain black appeared hauling a director's special, since involved in a crash at Dalguise on 1st August. 61508 was still in green as was 61528 seen at Craigellachie Junction: The Aberdeen-Inverness and a goods were both worked from Keith by Cal. 4-4-0's of 60A. The station was in the process of being repainted. |
SLS/195109 |
31/07/1952 |
Keith MPD |
Engines at Keith shed were 62231, 62225/42/56/65/8/9/72/5, 61502/7/8, 67292, 54473 an 57597. |
SLS/195208 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1896 |
To Service |
To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 19 Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4885 |
|
|
10/1913 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heating apparatus |
|
|
04/1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 6819 |
|
|
1937 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2231 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT) |
|
|
03/04/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62231 |
|
|
12/03/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Keith (KEI) |
|
|
21/11/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62231 |
|
|