Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 78 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 78 Week
» 11223 Month
» 111008 Year
» 1776384 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 20 m/e 02/1896
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6820 m/e 06/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2232 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 62232 w/e 04/09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Johnson / W. Pickersgill
Class D41
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number E747
Works Number 4886
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram 88
Train Brakes Westinghouse
Safety Valves Ramsbottom
To Service During 02/1896
Withdrawal Tue 16/10/1951
Service Life 55 yrs, 8 mths , 15 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1896
KIT   Kittybrewster on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61C   Keith 4w/e 23/12/1950
61C   Keith m/e 31/12/1950
     Withdrawn on 16/10/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61C Keith m/e 31/12/1950
WDN   on 16/10/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
1910 Vacuum Ejector fitted
07/1912 Steam heating apparatus
06/1947 LNER Diagram 88B boiler fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1896 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 20
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4886
   
1910 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
07/1912 Modification Modification: Steam heating apparatus    
06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6820    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2232    
06/1947 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 88B boiler fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT)    
04/09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62232    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Keith (61C)    
16/10/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 62232    

prev prev