Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 55 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 55 Week
» 7667 Month
» 74529 Year
» 1739905 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 22 m/e 02/1896
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6822 m/e 06/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2234 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 62234 w/e 24/04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Johnson / W. Pickersgill
Class D41
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number E747
Works Number 4888
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram 88
Train Brakes Westinghouse
Safety Valves Ramsbottom
To Service During 02/1896
Withdrawal Thu 10/11/1949
Service Life 53 yrs, 9 mths , 10 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1896
KEI   Keith on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 10/11/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KEI Keith on 10/02/1947
WDN KEI Keith on 10/11/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1913 Steam heating apparatus
10/1926 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/08/1947 Inverurie Works On 20/8 the following locos. were in the Works yard: 'D31' 2071, 'J36' (Number painted out but carrying plate 9653 - identified as 5229), old No. 'D41' 6879 (old No.), 'J36' 5251/72/87/91, 5302/32/36 (the latter marked 'scrap') 'G10' 7505, all complete; whilst those stripped were: 'D40' 2266/80, 'D31' (bearing plate 9765, old No.), 2067, 'J36' 5212/19. Locos. in the Works were 'D40' 2262/75, 'D41' 2234/42/44, 'J35' 4463/82/84, 'J36' 5257/69/84, 5325, while 'D41' 2256 and 'G5' 7287 were ex Works freshly painted. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1896 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 22
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 4888
   
11/1913 Modification Modification: Steam heating apparatus    
06/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 6822    
10/1926 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2234    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Keith (KEI)    
24/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62234    
10/11/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 62234    

prev prev