Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 1007 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 5499 Week
» 30333 Month
» 64665 Year
» 1730041 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 111 m/e 02/1898
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6911 y/e 1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2255 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 62255 w/e 08/05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Johnson / W. Pickersgill
Class D41
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number E787
Works Number 5222
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram 88
Train Brakes Westinghouse
Safety Valves Ramsbottom
To Service During 02/1898
Withdrawal Tue 27/05/1952
Service Life 54 yrs, 3 mths , 26 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1898
KEI   Keith on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 27/05/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 27/05/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1913 Steam heating apparatus
03/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/06/1950 Inverurie Works Engines into shops: 5282, 5323, 61543, 61560, 62241, 62255, 64466, 64477, 64487, 65236, 65306, 65340, and (L.M.S) 14447, 17326, 44312, 57337. SLS/195008

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1898 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 111
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 5222
   
05/1913 Modification Modification: Steam heating apparatus    
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6911    
03/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2255    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Keith (KEI)    
08/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 62255    
27/05/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 62255    

prev prev