Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 132 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4624 Week
» 29458 Month
» 63790 Year
» 1729166 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great North of Scotland Railway 112 m/e 02/1898
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 6912 y/e 1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 2256 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 62256 w/e 17/09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Johnson / W. Pickersgill
Class D41
Company History GNSR/LNER
Wheels 4-4-0
Builder Neilson, Reid & Co.
Order Number E787
Works Number 5223
Fittings (as built)
Boiler Diagram 88
Train Brakes Westinghouse
Safety Valves Ramsbottom
To Service During 02/1898
Withdrawal Tue 02/12/1952
Service Life 54 yrs, 10 mths , 1 dy

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1898
KEI   Keith on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 02/12/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 02/12/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1915 Steam heating apparatus
1937 Vacuum Ejector fitted
07/1947 LNER Diagram 88B boiler fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
20/08/1947 Inverurie Works On 20/8 the following locos. were in the Works yard: 'D31' 2071, 'J36' (Number painted out but carrying plate 9653 - identified as 5229), old No. 'D41' 6879 (old No.), 'J36' 5251/72/87/91, 5302/32/36 (the latter marked 'scrap') 'G10' 7505, all complete; whilst those stripped were: 'D40' 2266/80, 'D31' (bearing plate 9765, old No.), 2067, 'J36' 5212/19. Locos. in the Works were 'D40' 2262/75, 'D41' 2234/42/44, 'J35' 4463/82/84, 'J36' 5257/69/84, 5325, while 'D41' 2256 and 'G5' 7287 were ex Works freshly painted. SLS/194710
31/07/1951 G.N.O.S. Section - Keith In an afternoon's observation at the Junction B1's 61343/8/52, D41's 62231/56, D40's 62262, 62264/9, and B12/1 61508 were seen. The B1's were in excellent condition. The others were just clean. 62269 has a crest and also a tender cab. 62231 in plain black appeared hauling a director's special, since involved in a crash at Dalguise on 1st August. 61508 was still in green as was 61528 seen at Craigellachie Junction: The Aberdeen-Inverness and a goods were both worked from Keith by Cal. 4-4-0's of 60A. The station was in the process of being repainted. SLS/195109
31/07/1952 Keith MPD Engines at Keith shed were 62231, 62225/42/56/65/8/9/72/5, 61502/7/8, 67292, 54473 an 57597. SLS/195208

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1898 To Service To service as Great North of Scotland Railway Number 112
Built at Neilson, Reid & Co., Works Number 5223
   
02/1915 Modification Modification: Steam heating apparatus    
1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 6912    
1937 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 2256    
07/1947 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 88B boiler fitted    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Keith (KEI)    
17/09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 62256    
02/12/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 62256    

prev