Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 506 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19417 Week
» 84371 Month
» 287035 Year
» 3313888 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1942) |
7804 |
|
Not applied |
Great Eastern Railway |
494 |
m/e |
01/1895 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7494 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
2787 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
British Railways |
62787 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
E4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-0 |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
X34 |
To Service |
During 01/1895 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 20/11/1956 |
Service Life |
61 yrs, 10 mths , 20 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
01/1895 |
NOR |
|
Norwich Thorpe |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
31A |
|
Cambridge |
4w/e |
25/08/1956 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
20/11/1956 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
31A |
Cambridge |
4w/e |
18/08/1956 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
20/11/1956 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 7804 but not taken up |
|
|
01/1895 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 494 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7494 |
|
|
08/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2787 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Norwich Thorpe (NOR) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 62787 |
|
|
25/08/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cambridge (31A) |
|
|
20/11/1956 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 62787 |
|
|