Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 414 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3832 Week
» 28666 Month
» 62998 Year
» 1728374 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 776 m/e 03/1900
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5776 m/e 02/1926
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7104 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 67104 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Pollitt
Class F2
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F203/1900
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3694
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service During 03/1900
Withdrawal During 05/1949 off Annesley (ANN)
Service Life 49 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1949

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1900
ARD   Ardsley on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
ANN   Annesley w/e 12/02/1949
     Withdrawn m/e 05/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ARD Ardsley on 05/10/1947
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 12/02/1949
WDN ANN Annesley on 30/05/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1909 Saturated Diagram 20 Boiler Fitted
02/1937 Push and Pull Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1900 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 776
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3694
   
07/1909 Modification Modification: Saturated Diagram 20 Boiler Fitted    
02/1926 Renumbered Renumbered to 5776    
02/1937 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7104    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ardsley (ARD)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 67104 but not taken up    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
05/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 7104 from Annesley (ANN)    
07/1949 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev