Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 213 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 6839 Week
» 31673 Month
» 66005 Year
» 1731381 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 778 m/e 03/1900
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5778 m/e 04/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7106 on 20/01/1946
British Railways 67106 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Pollitt
Class F2
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F203/1900
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3696
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service During 03/1900
Withdrawal Fri 31/12/1948 off Annesley (ANN)
Service Life 48 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 03/1949

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1900
KX   Kings Cross on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
ANN   Annesley w/e 19/06/1948
     Withdrawn on 31/12/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 19/06/1948
WDN ANN Annesley on 31/12/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1913 Saturated Diagram 20 Boiler Fitted
11/1936 Push and Pull Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1900 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 778
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3696
   
01/1913 Modification Modification: Saturated Diagram 20 Boiler Fitted    
04/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5778    
11/1936 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
20/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7106    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX)    
19/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (ANN)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67106    
31/12/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 67106 from Annesley (ANN)    
03/1949 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev