Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 979 Today
» 1140 Yesterday
» 6590 Week
» 17636 Month
» 17636 Year
» 1683012 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 778 m/e 03/1900
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5778 m/e 04/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7106 on 20/01/1946
British Railways 67106 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Pollitt
Class F2
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F203/1900
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3696
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service During 03/1900
Withdrawal Fri 31/12/1948 off Annesley (ANN)
Scrapping During 03/1949
Service Life 48 yrs, 10 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1900
KX Kings Cross on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn on 31/12/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley w/e 19/06/1948
WDN ANN Annesley on 31/12/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1913 Saturated Diagram 20 Boiler Fitted
11/1936 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1948 Darlington Works 'L.1's' Nos. 9000-9015 are to be renumbered 67701-67716. No. 67717 (9016) is the first to come out under this number, while No. 9015 was altered to 67716. The paint dates of Nos. 9009-9012 are March, and Nos. 9013-9015 and 67717-67718 are April. The Works' Nos. are 2028-2036/48 respectively. The next order for North Road will be a batch of 'A.1' 'Pacifics.' The rumour of further 'B.1's' came about owing to Stooperdale building a batch of spare boilers for this class. Locomotives for shops or scrap during the period April 4th-May 2nd included:-Nos. 1440, E1461, 2391, 2747, 3037, 3170, 3286, 3315, 5069, 5625, 5768/88, 7306, 7649/88, 9837/52, 9917/33, 77414, 79198. The following locomotives have arrived for cutting-up:-ex G.E. Nos. 5380/83, 5400, 7120/37, 8212, ex MET Nos. 7511/12 and ex M.G.N. No. 8485. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 5778, 9856, 60510, 60825, 61011/60/71, 61420, 62388, 63125/40, 65624/50, 65825/47/51, 67263, 67301, 67632/84, 67718, 68248/90, 68724, 69786, 69875, 69910. The following locomotives have been painted or repainted green: Nos. 61011/60/71 an 67684. No. 60510 came off Works without nameplates, but returned and has at last had these fitted-Robert the Bruce. SLS/194806

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1900 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 778
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3696
   
04/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 5778    
20/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7106    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67106    
31/12/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 67106 from Annesley (ANN)    

prev prev