Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 27 Online
» 498 Today
» 1112 Yesterday
» 3916 Week
» 28750 Month
» 63082 Year
» 1728458 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Central Railway 783 m/e 04/1900
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 5783 m/e 04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7111 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 67111 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Pollitt
Class F2
Company History GCR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F204/1900
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 3701
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service During 04/1900
Withdrawal During 12/1950 off Kings Cross (34A)
Service Life 50 yrs, 7 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1951

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1900
KX   Kings Cross on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn m/e 12/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CHR Chester West 9w/e 31/03/1946
WDN   on 10/12/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1913 Saturated Diagram 20 Boiler Fitted
11/1936 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/08/1950 General Two N.E. Region engines recently named are 60127 Wilson Worsdell and 60153 Flamboyant of Heaton and York respectively. Owing to the scarcity of pull-and-push engines at King's Cross, the Alexandra Palace branch has been worked occasionally by 'N.2' tanks, Which run round the train. One of these, numbered 69540 on the bunker, had the former number 9540 visible on the tanks. A fitted 'N.7' from Neasden has also been assisting, as only one of the 'F.2' 2-4-2T (E.7111) now remains and is in poor shape. This engine, originally M.S. & L. No. 783, built by Beyer Peacock in 1896 (No. 3701), class '9G,' is the sole survivor of the G.C. 2-4-2T which once totalled 37 engines. SLS/195010
31/12/1950 Withdrawals Among the withdrawals will be noticed 43319 (Johnson goods, built in 1892 as M.R. 2042, class 2F, reboilered as 3F in 1905); 4162 (built in 1900 as M. & G.N. 87) one of the few small-boilered Ivatt goods and 7111 (built in 1896 as M.S. & L. 783), the last of its class to remain in service, recently on the push-pull service between Finsbury Park and Alexandra Palace. Also, the withdrawal of 2132, leaves only one Ivatt 4-4-0 class D.3 in stock (No. 62000, at Grantham) with side-window cab, used for working the official saloon. There is also one surviving D.2 (No. 62172 at Colwick). SLS/195102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1900 To Service To service as Great Central Railway Number 783
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 3701
   
10/1913 Modification Modification: Saturated Diagram 20 Boiler Fitted    
04/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 5783    
11/1936 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7111    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kings Cross (KX)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 67111 but not taken up    
12/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 7111 from Kings Cross (34A)    
01/1951 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev