Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 509 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6688 Week
» 10582 Month
» 110367 Year
» 1775743 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 675 m/e 12/1885
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7675 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class F4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F4 Joy12/1885
F4 Stephenson (2-4-2T)01/1897
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number E16
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 12/1885
Withdrawal During 08/1927
Service Life 41 yrs, 8 mths , 1 dy

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1885
     Withdrawn m/e 08/1927
PKS   Parkeston Quay on 25/01/1948
STG   Stirling w/e 25/12/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay on 25/01/1948
ALLOC STG Stirling w/e 25/12/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1897 17½" Cylinders fitted
01/1897 160lb. Boiler fitted
01/1897 Stephenson Valve Gear fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1946 General An interesting double-headed train is the 5.30 p.m. Clacton, which daily leaves with any combination of 'D.16/2,' 'D.16/3,' 'B.12/3,' and 'B.17' at the head. Spitalflelds goods has not seen very many strangers, but 3806 (6601) was a change recently. 'F.3' are still seen at Liverpool Street; locos noted being 7139 (8067), 7148 (8047), 7149 (8048), and 8081, all on the Woodford line fairly regularly between the end of June till October. This line also has had 'V.1' 7675 working along it late Sept./Oct., together with various 0-6-0Ts such as 8575, 8612, 8613, and 8633. The Ilford line usually gets the 'J.68' such as 7043 25/9 and 7048 28/8, whilst even the sparse Fenchurch Street service comes in for its share (8538 noted 30/11). The most usual 'J.15' in Liverpool Street are:-7545/6/7/60/5/6, 7641/4/6 and 5453 (7555), and they usually turn up on Brentwood or Gidea Park trains SLS/194701
30/04/1949 Darlington Works New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84.
Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460.
SLS/194906

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1885 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 675
Built at Stratford Works
   
01/1897 Modification Modification: 160lb. Boiler fitted    
01/1897 Modification Modification: 17½" Cylinders fitted    
01/1897 Modification Modification: Stephenson Valve Gear fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7675    
08/1927 Withdrawn Condemned as 7675    
25/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS)    
25/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Stirling (STG)    

prev prev