Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 543 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6722 Week
» 10616 Month
» 110401 Year
» 1775777 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 676 m/e 01/1886
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7676 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class F4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F4 Joy01/1886
F4 Stephenson (2-4-2T)10/1896
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number E16
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 01/1886
Withdrawal During 02/1926
Service Life 40 yrs , 1 mth

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1886
     Withdrawn m/e 02/1926
PKS   Parkeston Quay w/e 14/08/1948
STR   Stratford on 12/12/1948
EFD   Eastfield on 16/12/1948
EFD   Eastfield w/e 18/12/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay w/e 14/08/1948
ALLOC STR Stratford on 12/12/1948
ALLOC EFD Eastfield on 16/12/1948
ALLOC EFD Eastfield w/e 18/12/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1896 17½" Cylinders fitted
10/1896 160lb. Boiler fitted
10/1896 Stephenson Valve Gear fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1886 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 676
Built at Stratford Works
   
10/1896 Modification Modification: 160lb. Boiler fitted    
10/1896 Modification Modification: 17½" Cylinders fitted    
10/1896 Modification Modification: Stephenson Valve Gear fitted    
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7676    
02/1926 Withdrawn Condemned as 7676    
14/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS)    
12/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
16/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD)    
18/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (EFD)    

prev prev