Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 445 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6624 Week
» 10518 Month
» 110303 Year
» 1775679 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 141 m/e 06/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7141 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7188 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 67188 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class F4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F4 Stephenson06/1903
F5 (2-4-2T)09/1915
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number P55
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 06/1903
Withdrawal Thu 29/12/1955
Service Life 52 yrs, 6 mths , 28 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1903
COL   Colchester on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30A   Stratford w/e 17/11/1951
30E   Colchester 4w/e 16/05/1953
30A   Stratford 4w/e 21/11/1953
30E   Colchester 5w/e 17/12/1955
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC COL Colchester on 07/12/1946
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 17/11/1951
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 03/12/1955
WDN   on 29/12/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1903 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 141
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7141    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7188    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67188    
17/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
21/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
29/12/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67188    

prev prev