Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 429 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6608 Week
» 10502 Month
» 110287 Year
» 1775663 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 142 m/e 06/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7142 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7189 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 67189 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class F4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F4 Stephenson06/1903
F5 (2-4-2T)11/1911
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number P55
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 06/1903
Withdrawal Thu 20/12/1956
Service Life 53 yrs, 6 mths , 19 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1903
COL   Colchester on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 20/12/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford on 07/12/1946
ALLOC COL Colchester on 08/02/1947
WDN   on 20/12/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1903 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 142
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7142    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7189    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 67189    
20/12/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 67189    

prev prev