Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 553 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6732 Week
» 10626 Month
» 110411 Year
» 1775787 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 143 m/e 06/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7143 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7190 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 67190 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class F4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F4 Stephenson06/1903
F5 (2-4-2T)10/1911
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number P55
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 06/1903
Withdrawal Wed 23/11/1955
Service Life 52 yrs, 5 mths , 23 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1903
COL   Colchester on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32C   Lowestoft 4w/e 20/09/1952
32C   Lowestoft 4w/e 04/10/1952
     Withdrawn on 23/11/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 04/10/1952
WDN   on 23/11/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1903 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 143
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7143    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7190    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67190    
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
23/11/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67190    

prev prev