Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 531 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6710 Week
» 10604 Month
» 110389 Year
» 1775765 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 144 m/e 06/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7144 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7191 m/e 04/1946
British Railways 67191 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class F4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F4 Stephenson06/1903
F5 (2-4-2T)06/1916
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number P55
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 06/1903
Withdrawal Mon 21/11/1955
Service Life 52 yrs, 5 mths , 21 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1903
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
COL   Colchester w/e 24/01/1948
     Withdrawn on 21/11/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford on 24/05/1947
ALLOC COL Colchester w/e 24/01/1948
WDN   on 21/11/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1903 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 144
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7144    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7191    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
24/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (COL)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67191    
21/11/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67191    

prev prev