Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 621 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5340 Week
» 16485 Month
» 116270 Year
» 1781646 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 145 m/e 07/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7145 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7192 m/e 04/1946
British Railways 67192 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class F4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F4 Stephenson07/1903
F5 (2-4-2T)09/1913
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number P55
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 07/1903
Withdrawal Mon 21/04/1958
Service Life 54 yrs, 9 mths , 22 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1903
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30E   Colchester 5w/e 17/12/1955
     Withdrawn on 21/04/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 31/12/1955
WDN   on 21/04/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1903 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 145
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7145    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7192    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67192    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
21/04/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67192    

prev prev