Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 425 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6604 Week
» 10498 Month
» 110283 Year
» 1775659 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 781 m/e 10/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7781 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7194 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 67194 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class F4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F4 Stephenson10/1904
F5 (2-4-2T)11/1911
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number D58
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 10/1904
Withdrawal During 10/1956
Service Life 52 yrs

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1904
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
COL   Colchester w/e 24/01/1948
30A   Stratford 4w/e 16/05/1953
30E   Colchester 5w/e 23/04/1955
30A   Stratford 5w/e 24/03/1956
     Withdrawn m/e 10/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford on 12/04/1947
ALLOC COL Colchester w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 26/03/1955
ALLOC 30A Stratford 5w/e 31/03/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1904 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 781
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7781    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7194    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
24/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (COL)    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67194    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 67194    

prev prev