Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 552 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6731 Week
» 10625 Month
» 110410 Year
» 1775786 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 782 m/e 11/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7782 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7195 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 67195 w/e 02/12/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class F4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F4 Stephenson11/1904
F5 (2-4-2T)12/1911
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number D58
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 11/1904
Withdrawal Tue 06/05/1958
Service Life 53 yrs, 6 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1958

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1904
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
COL   Colchester w/e 24/01/1948
30A   Stratford 4w/e 22/03/1952
32C   Lowestoft 4w/e 18/10/1952
32C   Lowestoft 4w/e 01/11/1952
32D   Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 25/09/1954
32C   Lowestoft 6w/e 25/12/1954
30A   Stratford 4w/e 15/12/1956
     Withdrawn on 06/05/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford on 24/05/1947
ALLOC COL Colchester w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 22/03/1952
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 32E Yarmouth Vauxhall 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 04/12/1954
ALLOC 30A Stratford 3w/e 01/12/1956
WDN   on 06/05/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/06/1958 Stratford MPD On 29th June, the following were awaiting scrap-62536/80, 62788/97, 65442, 65508/34/5/74, 67195/212/27/30/1, 68490/1/4/5/546/55/68/607/32. In the previous week, 69496, 69609/43 were cut up. SLS/195807

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1904 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 782
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7782    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7195    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
24/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (COL)    
02/12/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 67195    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
25/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
25/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
06/05/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67195    
07/1958 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev