Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 529 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6708 Week
» 10602 Month
» 110387 Year
» 1775763 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 783 m/e 11/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7783 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7196 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 67196 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class F4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F4 Stephenson11/1904
F5 (2-4-2T)12/1911
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number D58
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 11/1904
Withdrawal w/e Mon 07/03/1955
Service Life 50 yrs, 4 mths , 4 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1904
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
COL   Colchester w/e 24/01/1948
     Withdrawn w/e 07/03/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford on 07/12/1946
ALLOC COL Colchester on 08/02/1947
ALLOC STR Stratford on 24/05/1947
ALLOC COL Colchester w/e 24/01/1948
WDN   w/e 07/03/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1904 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 783
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7783    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7196    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
24/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (COL)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67196    
07/03/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67196    

prev prev