Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 465 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6644 Week
» 10538 Month
» 110323 Year
» 1775699 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 786 m/e 11/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7786 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7199 m/e 08/1946
British Railways 67199 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class F4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F4 Stephenson11/1904
F5 (2-4-2T)03/1912
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number D58
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 11/1904
Withdrawal Tue 05/02/1957
Service Life 52 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1951

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1904
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
YAR   Yarmouth South Town w/e 12/11/1949
30A   Stratford 4w/e 25/09/1954
32D   Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 13/11/1954
32C   Lowestoft 5w/e 23/07/1955
32D   Yarmouth South Town 5w/e 22/10/1955
30A   Stratford 5w/e 19/01/1957
     Withdrawn on 05/02/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC YAR Yarmouth South Town w/e 12/11/1949
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 26/01/1957
WDN   on 05/02/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1949 Push and Pull Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1904 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 786
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7786    
08/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7199    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67199    
11/1949 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
12/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR)    
02/1951 Scrapped Scrapped    
25/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
13/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
22/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
19/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
05/02/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 67199    

prev prev