Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 954 Today
» 1160 Yesterday
» 4279 Week
» 4279 Month
» 71141 Year
» 1736517 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 789 m/e 12/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7789 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7218 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 67218 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class F4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F4 Stephenson12/1904
F6 (2-4-2T)07/1912
F5 (2-4-2T)12/1948
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number D58
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 12/1904
Withdrawal Mon 10/03/1958
Service Life 53 yrs, 3 mths , 8 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1904
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
LOW   Lowestoft w/e 24/04/1948
YAR   Yarmouth South Town w/e 12/11/1949
30A   Stratford 4w/e 23/10/1954
32D   Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 13/11/1954
30A   Stratford 5w/e 23/04/1955
     Withdrawn on 10/03/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford on 07/12/1946
ALLOC LOW Lowestoft w/e 24/04/1948
ALLOC YAR Yarmouth South Town w/e 12/11/1949
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 23/04/1955
WDN   on 10/03/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
11/1949 Push and Pull Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1904 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 789
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7789    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7218    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67218    
24/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW)    
11/1949 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
12/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR)    
23/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
13/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
23/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/03/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67218    

prev prev