Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 425 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1333 Week
» 12478 Month
» 112263 Year
» 1777639 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 800 m/e 07/1892
Great Eastern Railway 790 m/e 12/1904
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7790 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7219 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 67219 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class F4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F4 Stephenson12/1904
F6 (2-4-2T)11/1912
F5 (2-4-2T)12/1948
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number D58
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 12/1904
Withdrawal Tue 06/11/1956
Service Life 51 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1957

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1904
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
COL   Colchester w/e 14/01/1950
30A   Stratford 4w/e 22/03/1952
     Withdrawn on 06/11/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford on 07/06/1947
ALLOC COL Colchester w/e 14/01/1950
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 22/03/1952
WDN   on 06/11/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/02/1948 Stratford Works The following locomotives were seen stripped: Nos. *1518, 2620, 4766, 5391, *7118, *7122, *7148, 7203/18, an 9659, while in the process of being stripped were: Nos. 1623/39/52, 5522, an 8529. The following were in course of erection: Nos. 1046/7, 1609/10/21/31/53/59/61/2/3/6 an 8764; No. 4889 was complete, and No. 1553 was apparently in for examination. Awaiting Works at various points were: Nos. 1509/*44/78, 1624, 2536/63, 2590, 2602, 4663/89, *5360/*80/3, 5400/10/18/52, 5506, *7119/*20. *7130/*1/*2/*5/*6/*7/*44/*7/83, 7219/26/37, *7511/*2, 8168/74, 8213, 8372, *8485/*8/9, 8791/6, 8854 an 9604. *Officially withdrawn. The Paint Shop produced the following all newly painted, lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' in yellow paint and prefixed 'E': Nos. 1056, 4687, 5565, an 8376. No. 8082 was stored here. The first locomotive to have been lettered in the above new style was No. 8619, which in addition was painted green and is now to be seen at Liverpool Street, acting as station pilot. The Running Shed produced the following additional locomotives painted in the new style: Nos. 1045, 1664, an 1667 SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1892 Renumbered Renumbered to 800    
12/1904 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 790
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7790    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7219    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67219    
14/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (COL)    
22/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
06/11/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 67219    
02/1957 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev