Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 506 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6685 Week
» 10579 Month
» 110364 Year
» 1775740 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 100 m/e 10/1905
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7100 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7206 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 67206 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class F4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F4 Stephenson10/1905
F5 (2-4-2T)01/1912
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number R58
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 10/1905
Withdrawal Tue 27/09/1955
Service Life 49 yrs, 11 mths , 28 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1905
PKS   Parkeston Quay on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
STR   Stratford w/e 14/02/1948
32C   Lowestoft 4w/e 14/02/1953
     Withdrawn on 27/09/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay on 12/04/1947
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 14/02/1948
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 21/02/1953
WDN   on 27/09/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1905 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 100
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7100    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7206    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Parkeston Quay (PKS)    
14/02/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 67206    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
27/09/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67206    

prev prev