Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 514 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6693 Week
» 10587 Month
» 110372 Year
» 1775748 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 103 m/e 11/1905
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7103 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7207 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 67207 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class F4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F4 Stephenson11/1905
F5 (2-4-2T)09/1911
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number C59
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 11/1905
Withdrawal Tue 06/12/1955
Service Life 50 yrs, 1 mth , 5 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1905
COL   Colchester on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32C   Lowestoft 4w/e 14/02/1953
     Withdrawn on 06/12/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC STR Stratford m/e 03/12/1945
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 21/02/1953
WDN   on 06/12/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1905 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 103
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7103    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7207    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67207    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
06/12/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67207    

prev prev