Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 115 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17918 Week
» 70934 Month
» 190461 Year
» 3217314 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
244 |
m/e |
09/1906 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7244 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7152 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
67152 |
m/e |
11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
F4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
I60 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 09/1906 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 04/02/1952 |
Service Life |
45 yrs, 5 mths , 4 dys |
Information |
Carried the letter E during secondment to the War Department instead of it's usual number |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1940 |
Wartime Armour Plating fitted |
09/1943 |
Wartime Armour Plating removed |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/09/1947 |
Stratford Works |
Commemoration plates are being fitted to certain engines of Class 'F4' which were used on war service. Plates noted on Nose 7152 and 7162 read as follows:-'During the war of 1939-1945 this locomotive was armoured and hauled defence trains on the coast lines.' The frames of Claud Hamilton still exist in a siding near the Paint Shop. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1906 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 244 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7244 |
|
|
06/1940 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
06/1940 |
Modification |
Modification: Wartime Armour Plating fitted |
|
|
07/1943 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
09/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: Wartime Armour Plating removed |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7152 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Melton Constable (MC) |
|
|
11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67152 |
|
|
21/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E) |
|
|
28/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth Vauxhall (32E) |
|
|
04/02/1952 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67152 |
|
|