Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1711 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15117 Week
» 68133 Month
» 187660 Year
» 3214513 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
589 |
m/e |
06/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7589 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7213 |
m/e |
09/1946 |
British Railways |
67213 |
m/e |
02/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
F4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
D63 |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 06/1907 |
Withdrawal |
During 05/1955 |
Service Life |
47 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1955 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1907 |
COL |
|
Colchester |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
STR |
|
Stratford |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
05/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
m/e |
03/12/1945 |
ALLOC |
COL |
Colchester |
on |
12/04/1947 |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/02/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
1949 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
1949 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
09/1949 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 589 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7589 |
|
|
09/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7213 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Colchester (COL) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67213 |
|
|
09/1949 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
05/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67213 |
|
|
06/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|