Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 513 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6692 Week
» 10586 Month
» 110371 Year
» 1775747 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 590 m/e 07/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7590 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7214 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 67214 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class F4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F4 Stephenson07/1907
F5 (2-4-2T)07/1915
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number D63
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 07/1907
Withdrawal Mon 05/05/1958
Service Life 50 yrs, 10 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1958

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1907
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32C   Lowestoft 4w/e 27/12/1952
32C   Lowestoft 5w/e 17/01/1953
32D   Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 25/09/1954
32C   Lowestoft 4w/e 13/11/1954
30A   Stratford 4w/e 15/12/1956
     Withdrawn on 05/05/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay on 12/04/1947
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 13/09/1947
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 27/12/1952
ALLOC 32E Yarmouth Vauxhall 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 04/12/1954
ALLOC 30A Stratford 3w/e 01/12/1956
WDN   on 05/05/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1907 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 590
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7590    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7214    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67214    
27/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
17/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
25/09/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
13/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
15/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
05/1958 Scrapped Scrapped    
05/05/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 67214    

prev prev