Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 134 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17937 Week
» 70953 Month
» 190480 Year
» 3217333 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
220 |
m/e |
10/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7220 |
y/e |
1924 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
F4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
G63 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 10/1907 |
Withdrawal |
During 05/1934 |
Service Life |
26 yrs , 7 mths |
Information |
Vacuum ejector fitted when built |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
PKS |
Parkeston Quay |
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
ALLOC |
STR |
Stratford |
4w/e |
27/11/1948 |
ALLOC |
IPS |
Ipswich |
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
06/09/1947 |
Stratford Works |
New boilers are being made for at least two non-standard classes. Those noted were:-Nos. 2446 dated 1947 on Class 'F6' No. 7225, 2447 dated 1947 waiting to go on Class 'F6' No. 7220, 4476/47 on Class 'J20/l' No. 4688 (which had previously carried a similar round top-boiler, 4477/47 on Class 'J20/1' No. 4693 and 4478/47 waiting to go on Class 'J20/1' No. 4677. The above boilers all have round-top fireboxes. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 220 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7220 |
|
|
05/1934 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 7220 |
|
|
22/05/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (PKS) |
|
|
27/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (STR) |
|
|
10/12/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|