Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 295 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5014 Week
» 16159 Month
» 115944 Year
» 1781320 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 223 m/e 11/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7223 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class F4
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number H63
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 11/1907
Withdrawal During 02/1935
Service Life 27 yrs , 3 mths

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1907
     Withdrawn m/e 02/1935

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC COL Colchester on 07/12/1946
ALLOC STR Stratford on 28/12/1946
ALLOC PKS Parkeston Quay on 06/09/1947
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 22/11/1947
ALLOC MEL   w/e 29/11/1947
ALLOC YB Yarmouth Beach w/e 13/12/1947

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1907 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 223
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7223    
02/1935 Withdrawn Condemned as 7223    

prev prev