Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 290 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5009 Week
» 16154 Month
» 115939 Year
» 1781315 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 224 m/e 11/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7224 y/e 1924

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class F4
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number H63
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 11/1907
Withdrawal During 02/1935
Service Life 27 yrs , 3 mths

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1907
     Withdrawn m/e 02/1935
COL   Colchester w/e 24/01/1948
STR   Stratford w/e 22/05/1948
MEL     w/e 26/06/1948
NOR   Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 25/12/1948
YAR   Yarmouth South Town w/e 09/07/1949
NOR   Norwich Thorpe w/e 08/10/1949
LOW   Lowestoft w/e 26/11/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC COL Colchester w/e 24/01/1948
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 22/05/1948
ALLOC MEL   w/e 26/06/1948
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC YAR Yarmouth South Town w/e 09/07/1949
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 08/10/1949
ALLOC LOW Lowestoft w/e 26/11/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1907 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 224
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7224    
02/1935 Withdrawn Condemned as 7224    
24/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (COL)    
22/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
26/06/1948 Allocation      
25/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
09/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR)    
08/10/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
26/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW)    

prev prev