Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 311 Today
» 992 Yesterday
» 5030 Week
» 16175 Month
» 115960 Year
» 1781336 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 232 m/e 11/1907
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7232 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7165 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 67165 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class F4
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number H63
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 11/1907
Withdrawal Mon 15/01/1951
Service Life 43 yrs, 2 mths , 15 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1907
LOW   Lowestoft on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 15/01/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe on 09/05/1947
ALLOC LOW Lowestoft on 25/05/1947
WDN   on 15/01/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1907 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 232
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7232    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7165    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Lowestoft (LOW)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67165    
15/01/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 67165    

prev prev