Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 297 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18100 Week
» 71116 Month
» 190643 Year
» 3217496 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Great Eastern Railway |
232 |
m/e |
11/1907 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
7232 |
y/e |
1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
7165 |
m/e |
12/1946 |
British Railways |
67165 |
m/e |
08/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
J. Holden |
Class |
F4 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
2-4-2T |
Builder |
Stratford Works |
Order Number |
H63 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 11/1907 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 15/01/1951 |
Service Life |
43 yrs, 2 mths , 15 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1907 |
LOW |
|
Lowestoft |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
15/01/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
on |
09/05/1947 |
ALLOC |
LOW |
Lowestoft |
on |
25/05/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
15/01/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 232 Built at Stratford Works |
|
|
1924 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7232 |
|
|
12/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 7165 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Lowestoft (LOW) |
|
|
08/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 67165 |
|
|
15/01/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 67165 |
|
|