Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 507 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6686 Week
» 10580 Month
» 110365 Year
» 1775741 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 170 m/e 08/1908
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7170 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7215 m/e 04/1946
British Railways 67215 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class F4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F4 Stephenson08/1908
F5 (2-4-2T)01/1915
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number S64
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 08/1908
Withdrawal Mon 19/09/1955
Service Life 47 yrs, 1 mth , 19 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1908
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
COL   Colchester m/e 30/11/1949
COL   Colchester w/e 10/12/1949
30A   Stratford w/e 17/11/1951
     Withdrawn on 19/09/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC COL Colchester w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 17/11/1951
WDN   on 19/09/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1908 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 170
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7170    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7215    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67215    
30/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (COL)    
10/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (COL)    
17/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
19/09/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67215    

prev prev