Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 538 Today
» 953 Yesterday
» 6717 Week
» 10611 Month
» 110396 Year
» 1775772 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 188 m/e 02/1909
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7188 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7217 m/e 04/1946
British Railways 67217 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer J. Holden
Class F4
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F4 Stephenson02/1909
F5 (2-4-2T)06/1920
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number A65
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 02/1909
Withdrawal Mon 21/11/1955
Service Life 46 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1909
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30A   Stratford w/e 17/11/1951
30E   Colchester 4w/e 20/09/1952
30E   Colchester 4w/e 04/10/1952
     Withdrawn on 21/11/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 17/11/1951
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 04/10/1952
WDN   on 21/11/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1909 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 188
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7188    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7217    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67217    
17/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
21/11/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67217    

prev prev