Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 204 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1273 Week
» 1273 Month
» 68135 Year
» 1733511 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 62 m/e 04/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7062 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7221 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 67221 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class F6
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F604/1911
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number G69
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 04/1911
Withdrawal Thu 31/10/1957
Service Life 46 yrs , 7 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1957

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1911
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
CAM   Cambridge w/e 07/01/1950
KL   Kings Lynn w/e 21/01/1950
31E   Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 23/12/1950
31E   Bury St Edmunds m/e 31/12/1950
31A   Cambridge 4w/e 29/11/1952
31A   Cambridge 4w/e 13/12/1952
31C   Kings Lynn 4w/e 23/10/1954
31A   Cambridge 6w/e 25/12/1954
30A   Stratford 5w/e 17/12/1955
     Withdrawn on 31/10/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 07/01/1950
ALLOC KL Kings Lynn w/e 21/01/1950
ALLOC 31E Bury St Edmunds m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 31A Cambridge 4w/e 01/01/1955
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 31/12/1955
WDN   on 31/10/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
01/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1911 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 62
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7062    
09/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
01/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7221    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 67221    
07/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
21/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (KL)    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
13/12/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
23/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
25/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (31A)    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
31/10/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 67221    
11/1957 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev