Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 819 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 6350 Week
» 31184 Month
» 65516 Year
» 1730892 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 63 m/e 04/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7063 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7222 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 67222 m/e 10/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class F6
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F604/1911
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number G69
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 04/1911
Withdrawal Wed 17/08/1955
Service Life 44 yrs, 4 mths , 17 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1911
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
KL   Kings Lynn 4w/e 27/11/1948
CAM   Cambridge w/e 21/01/1950
31E   Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 09/08/1952
31E   Bury St Edmunds 5w/e 23/08/1952
     Withdrawn on 17/08/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KL Kings Lynn 4w/e 27/11/1948
ALLOC CAM Cambridge w/e 21/01/1950
ALLOC 31E Bury St Edmunds 4w/e 09/08/1952
WDN   on 17/08/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
04/1938 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1911 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 63
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7063    
10/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
04/1938 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7222    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
10/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67222    
27/11/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (KL)    
21/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cambridge (CAM)    
09/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
23/08/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Bury St Edmunds (31E)    
17/08/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67222    

prev prev