Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 637 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4983 Week
» 4983 Month
» 71845 Year
» 1737221 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 64 m/e 05/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7064 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7223 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 67223 m/e 05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class F6
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F605/1911
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number G69
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 05/1911
Withdrawal Tue 13/12/1955
Service Life 44 yrs, 7 mths , 13 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1911
YB   Yarmouth Beach on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
32C   Lowestoft 4w/e 24/10/1953
     Withdrawn on 13/12/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 31/10/1953
WDN   on 13/12/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
09/1936 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1911 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 64
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7064    
09/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
09/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7223    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Yarmouth Beach (YB)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 67223    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
13/12/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 67223    

prev prev