Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 449 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5924 Week
» 5924 Month
» 72786 Year
» 1738162 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Eastern Railway 65 m/e 05/1911
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 7065 y/e 1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 7224 m/e 07/1946
British Railways 67224 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer S. Holden
Class F6
Company History GER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
F605/1911
Wheels 2-4-2T
Builder Stratford Works
Order Number G69
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 05/1911
Withdrawal Mon 19/11/1956
Service Life 45 yrs, 6 mths , 20 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1911
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
YAR   Yarmouth South Town m/e 07/1949
LOW   Lowestoft m/e 30/11/1949
32A   Norwich Thorpe w/e 09/07/1950
32G   Melton Constable w/e 30/07/1950
32A   Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/09/1950
32A   Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 23/09/1950
32G   Melton Constable 4w/e 20/10/1951
32C   Lowestoft 5w/e 17/12/1955
     Withdrawn on 19/11/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 09/07/1950
ALLOC 32G Melton Constable w/e 30/07/1950
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 17/09/1950
ALLOC 32G Melton Constable w/e 20/10/1951
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 03/12/1955
WDN   on 19/11/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1927 Vacuum Ejector fitted
06/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1911 To Service To service as Great Eastern Railway Number 65
Built at Stratford Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 7065    
09/1927 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
06/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
07/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 7224    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (YAR)    
30/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (LOW)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 67224    
09/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
30/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G)    
17/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
23/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G)    
17/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
19/11/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 67224    

prev prev